Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 51 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4966 Week
» 16203 Month
» 249123 Year
» 1914499 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C22 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 33022 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B   Ramsgate 6w/e 27/03/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953
70C   Guildford 4w/e 01/10/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 26/09/1947
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 01/10/1953
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1961 Ashford MPD (73F) (ex-works) On shed waiting works-31583 an 31714, ex-works-30902, 31612, 31794, 33008/22/9/30. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C22
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 33022    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 33022    
10/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev