|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/05/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1942 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number C26 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 33026 | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) | ||
08/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) | ||
05/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) | ||
01/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Feltham (70B) | ||
24/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
06/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Feltham (70B) | ||
20/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
08/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
26/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 33026 | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |