Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C35 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
British Railways |
33035 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/06/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1942 |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
70C |
|
Guildford |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/06/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C35 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33035 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
14/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33035 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|