|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/05/1948 | General | Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. | SLS/194806 |
07/09/1963 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1942 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number C37 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) | ||
01/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 33037 | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) | ||
27/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
13/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
06/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
06/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 33037 |