Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 558 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3484 Week
» 5222 Month
» 132665 Year
» 1798041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8001 m/e 06/1935
British Railways 48001 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 242
To Service During 06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/01/1965
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1935
20A   Holbeck (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20D   Normanton w/e 07/02/1948
20H   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 31/07/1948
17A   Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952
17A   Derby 4w/e 23/02/1952
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/03/1952
16D   Mansfield 4w/e 30/01/1954
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 09/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 20H Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 31/07/1948
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 16D Mansfield 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 09/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 1 bay) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
15/11/1964 Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe South MPD (Ex or waiting works) Ex or waiting works: 42979, 44679/777, 45076/553, 48001/132/94. 70036, 80072/125, 92113/206. SLS/196503
27/06/1965 Crewe South MPD (Waiting works) Waiting works: 44683, 45102, 48001, 70014/51, 78025. ex-Works: 44852/929, 48095/410, 70012, 92024/91. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8001
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 242
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (20D)    
31/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H)    
08/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48001    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
09/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48001    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev