13/02/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop, 1 bay) |
Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. |
SLS/195903 |
10/03/1959 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. |
SLS/195904 |
29/01/1961 |
Market Harborough MPD |
The sub shed of Leicester is supplied with two engines for its two turns viz. Welham shunt (Class 4F) and Ivatt 2-6-2T for Seaton workings; 41321 has been working this latter turn and leaves shed at 7-05 a.m. for Seaton. Locomotives on shed on 29th January were 41321, 43949, 44242/9, 44716, 46445, 48010/36/529/671 an 90554. |
SLS/196103 |
16/10/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. |
SLS/196111 |
05/11/1961 |
Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on shed) |
Ex-Works on shed: D138 new, D2507, 43932, 44178, 44248/94, 44433, 47250, 47327/88, 48010/53/7, 73159, 75035. |
SLS/196112 |
27/02/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. |
SLS/196604 |