Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 504 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3430 Week
» 5168 Month
» 132611 Year
» 1797987 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8011 m/e 10/1935
British Railways 48011 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 252
To Service During 10/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/05/1967
Service Life 31 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1935
18B   Westhouses on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2C   Northampton w/e 19/06/1948
1A   Willesden w/e 11/02/1950
9G   Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
9G   Northwich 4w/e 02/12/1950
17A   Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952
17A   Derby 4w/e 23/02/1952
19C   Canklow 4w/e 01/01/1955
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/01/1960
16D   Annesley w/e 22/09/1962
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 03/08/1963
1A   Willesden w/e 19/06/1965
9L   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 24/07/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 31/07/1965
9J   Agecroft w/e 18/09/1965
9H   Patricroft w/e 22/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 27/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2C Northampton w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 19/06/1948
LOAN CAR Carlisle Canal w/e 28/08/1948
EXLOAN 2C Northampton w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 9G Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 19C Canklow 4w/e 25/12/1954
LOAN 41D Canklow on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 3w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 27/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/02/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, 2 bay) Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. SLS/195903
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
18/06/1967 Crewe South MPD (condemned or waiting Works) Stored-LNER 4498, 44843, 45042, 45243/64/98, 45353/91, 45494; condemned or waiting Works-43024/34, 44666/85, 44737/79, 44800/12/4/60/5, 45006/33, 45197, 45446, 47566, 48011/449/502/548/705, 71000, 78036, 92032. SLS/196708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8011
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 252
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2C)    
28/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48011    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (19C)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
31/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
18/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
27/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48011    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev