Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1215 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14621 Week
» 67637 Month
» 187164 Year
» 3214017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
70591 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
British Railways |
48016 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-130 |
To Service |
During 01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/11/1965 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys |
Information |
WD 70591 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
STOCK |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
17/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
1H |
Northampton |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Oxley |
5w/e |
09/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
2E |
Saltley |
4w/e |
10/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/11/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 70591 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-130 |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48016 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (1H) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
27/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48016 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|