Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 339 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2040 Week
» 10155 Month
» 137598 Year
» 1802974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8017 m/e 01/1937
British Railways 48017 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-130
To Service During 01/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/11/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1937
19A   Sheffield Grimesthorpe on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A   Wakefield w/e 30/04/1949
6B   Mold Junction 5w/e 16/07/1949
6B   Mold Junction w/e 23/07/1949
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/11/1951
8D   Widnes 4w/e 31/10/1953
8E   Northwich w/e 15/11/1958
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 13/02/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
8A   Edge Hill w/e 17/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 04/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 02/04/1949
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 09/04/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 30/04/1949
LOAN 6B Mold Junction w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 8A Edge Hill w/e 04/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8017
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-130
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48017    
30/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48017    
07/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev