Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2745 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16151 Week
» 69167 Month
» 188694 Year
» 3215547 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8029 |
m/e |
08/1936 |
British Railways |
48029 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
4706 |
To Service |
During 08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 27/07/1963 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8029 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4706 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48029 |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48029 |
|
|
07/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|