|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1945 | Belle Vue MPD | Locos seen during October included: 1097 22B, 3173 20G, 6272 22A, 5303 8A, 5364 12A, 5590 22A, 8908 5B, 9029 10A, 12336 23E, 12562 24D, 12857 23B, 12861 23B. 8037 18A was noted on a troop train on 4/10. | SLS/194601 |
27/02/1966 | Crewe Works (Works yard) | Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. | SLS/196604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8037 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4714 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) | ||
01/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48037 | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
28/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
24/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
21/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
29/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) | ||
11/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) | ||
25/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (16D) | ||
03/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
25/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48037 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |