Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8074 m/e 12/1936
British Railways 48074 w/e 04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4751
To Service During 12/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/11/1967 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1936
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15A   Wellingborough w/e 15/05/1948
16B   Spital Bridge w/e 02/10/1948
12B   Carlisle Canal on 13/08/1950
12B   Carlisle Canal 4w/e 09/09/1950
12B   Carlisle Canal w/e 16/09/1950
1A   Willesden w/e 02/06/1951
1A   Willesden 4w/e 16/06/1951
1E   Bletchley w/e 20/06/1959
8C   Speke Junction w/e 22/08/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 07/11/1959
2B   Nuneaton w/e 18/06/1960
2A   Rugby w/e 07/07/1962
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/03/1963
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 04/06/1966
29F     w/e 19/08/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 25/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 16B Spital Bridge w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Canal on 13/08/1950
LOAN 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 19/08/1950
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Canal w/e 16/09/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 2A Rugby 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/03/1963
LOAN 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 09/09/1967
WDN 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 25/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1950 Inter regional allocations The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). SLS/195012
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8074
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4751
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
15/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (16B)    
04/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48074    
13/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B)    
16/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B)    
02/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
19/08/1967 Allocation      
25/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48074 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
04/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev