Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 291 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1992 Week
» 10107 Month
» 137550 Year
» 1802926 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8082 m/e 01/1937
British Railways 48082 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 4759
To Service During 01/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/04/1967
Service Life 30 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1937
15A   Wellingborough on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton 8w/e 16/07/1955
18B   Westhouses 4w/e 13/08/1955
18C   Hasland m/e 16/06/1956
18A   Toton w/e 22/09/1962
15C   Kettering w/e 11/01/1964
15B   Wellingborough w/e 15/02/1964
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 11/04/1964
15B   Wellingborough w/e 18/04/1964
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 26/06/1965
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/06/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 15/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 18C Hasland w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 15C Kettering 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/07/1966
WDN   w/e 15/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8082
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4759
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48082    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15C)    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
11/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
25/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
15/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48082    
11/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev