Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8083 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
British Railways |
48083 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
4760 |
To Service |
During 01/1937 to Westhouses (18B) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/11/1966 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
19C |
Canklow |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
ALLOC |
16G |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
ALLOC |
16B |
Colwick |
5w/e |
12/11/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/11/1965 |
Derby MPD (Stored) |
Ex-Works D119, D1894, D1915/7/20, D2505, D3581, D3769. Stored-42165, 44932, 45262/89, 48083. 48170, 48510, 48666, 78000, 92096. |
SLS/196601 |
04/09/1966 |
Derby Shed (Stored) |
Stored: 48083, 48103, 48270, 48370, 48604; Ex-Works: D163, D1950, D3248, D4155, D5177. Waiting Works: D5215/45/408. |
SLS/196610 |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8083 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4760 Allocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48083 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (16B) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48083 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|