Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8103 m/e 02/1939
British Railways 48103 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-143
To Service During 02/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1966
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1939
20C   Royston on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18D   Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 31/12/1955
26F   Patricroft w/e 08/12/1962
17A   Derby w/e 25/05/1963
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 22/06/1963
16C   Derby w/e 16/11/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 31/12/1955
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) on 23/02/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 08/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/02/1966 Derby Works (Stored) Erecting Shop: D2, D20/1/2, D31/9, D82/5, D128, D132, D2502/4/13, D3124, D3861, D5014/5/42/97, D5133/6, D5397, D5403/13, D7578, D7604-9, 12025/39/40/75/88/94; Paint shop: D45, D130, D5387, D7601; Test House Area: D127, D3126, D5032/74, D5385, D7600; Finishing shop: D61, D152, D5182, D5381, D7602/3; Works yard: D19, D41, D64, D107, D121, D160, D2236, D2506/11, D3117, D3800, D4143, D5006/24/50/7/81/3, D5213, D5378/83, D5404, D7595, 12047/98; New or ex-Works: D1880, D1929/30, D3305, D3587, D3787, D3843, D5011/43, D7598/9, 12055/72; Stored: 42165, 44932, 48103, ED2, ED4, ED5, 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196603
13/03/1966 Derby MPD (Stored) New or ex-Works: D155, D1934/5, 12025/39/40/72/5, D2502/4, D3126/305/568/87, D5381/403/4; Stored: 42165, 48103, 48666; Waiting Works: D46, D74, D5406. SLS/196604
04/09/1966 Derby Shed (Stored) Stored: 48083, 48103, 48270, 48370, 48604; Ex-Works: D163, D1950, D3248, D4155, D5177. Waiting Works: D5215/45/408. SLS/196610
27/11/1966 Derby Works (Stored on shed) Erecting shop-D28, D42, D50, D60/3/7, D89, D98, D2857, 12012/95, 15000, D3052, D3246/92, D3781, D5033/77/85/91/7, D5108/63/91/9, D5210/6/45, D5393, D54C6, D7669-7674. Finishing shop-D57, D102, D5155, D5201, D7668. Paint shop-D5100, D7667. Test House-D72, D91, D129, D7663. Works yard-D4, D8, D11/4, D125/33, D2513/7, D3022, D5150/2/65/94, D7660/5/6, 12064, 15001. Ex-Works: D1955, D2225, D2509, D5181, D5228, D8177, 12087. Stored on shed-47000, 48103. Stored on Works-ED2/4/5, 10000/201/2/3, D3122/3/4/6, D5383. SLS/196701
15/01/1967 Derby MPD (stored) On shed ex-Works- D102, D7668, D8186-9; stored-47000, 48103, u79961. SLS/196702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8103
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-143
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48103    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
16/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
08/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48103    
02/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev