Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 207 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1276 Week
» 1276 Month
» 68138 Year
» 1733514 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8106 m/e 02/1939
British Railways 48106 w/e 18/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-143
To Service During 02/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 28 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1939
17C   Coalville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 27/03/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/12/1949
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 31/10/1953
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 04/12/1954
9D   Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 25/02/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 19/05/1956
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 17/05/1958
1A   Willesden w/e 18/02/1961
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 06/05/1961
9D   Newton Heath w/e 30/11/1963
9M   Bury w/e 10/10/1964
9K   Bolton w/e 10/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 06/03/1948
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 27/03/1948
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9M Bury w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8106
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-143
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Coalville (17C)    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
18/03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48106    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (9M)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48106    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev