Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 898 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5525 Week
» 7263 Month
» 134706 Year
» 1800082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8108 m/e 02/1939
British Railways 48108 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-143
To Service During 02/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/09/1967
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1939
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16D   Mansfield 4w/e 09/08/1952
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 08/08/1953
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 14/03/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 03/04/1965
9L   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 14/05/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 02/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16D Mansfield 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 9L Buxton (LNWR) 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 02/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8108
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-143
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48108    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
14/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
02/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48108    
02/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev