Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4647 Week
» 6385 Month
» 133828 Year
» 1799204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8124 m/e 06/1939
British Railways 48124 w/e 01/12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-149
To Service During 06/1939
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/05/1968 off Edge Hill (8A)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1939
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 22/06/1946
15B   Kettering on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby w/e 07/11/1959
16G   Westhouses w/e 07/08/1965
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/10/1965
8A   Edge Hill w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 04/05/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15B Kettering w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 06/11/1965
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN 8A Edge Hill w/e 04/05/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/03/1965 Crewe Works (Waiting Works) Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1939 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8124
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-149
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B)    
01/12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 48124    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48124 from Edge Hill (8A)    
10/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev