Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 600 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3526 Week
» 5264 Month
» 132707 Year
» 1798083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8132 m/e 03/1941
British Railways 48132 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 03/1941
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/06/1968
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1941
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/06/1950
14A   Cricklewood East 2w/e 17/06/1950
18A   Toton w/e 23/05/1959
15B   Kettering w/e 23/06/1962
15B   Wellingborough w/e 18/01/1964
15E   Coalville w/e 15/05/1965
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 22/05/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 04/02/1967
9D   Newton Heath w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 22/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 22/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209
24/01/1965 Crewe South MPD (Ex or waiting works) Ex or waiting works: 42979, 44679/777, 45076/553, 48001/132/94. 70036, 80072/125, 92113/206. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1941 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8132
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48132    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
15/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15E)    
22/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
04/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48132    
11/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev