Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1149 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24780 Week
» 89734 Month
» 292398 Year
» 3319251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8139 |
m/e |
12/1941 |
British Railways |
48139 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 12/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8139 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48139 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48139 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|