Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8166 m/e 04/1943
British Railways 48166 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1967
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 19/06/1948
8C   Speke Junction w/e 03/07/1948
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 17/07/1948
8D   Widnes w/e 15/11/1958
6B   Mold Junction w/e 25/07/1959
8E   Northwich w/e 09/04/1960
6B   Mold Junction w/e 28/05/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 18/06/1960
8C   Speke Junction w/e 15/04/1961
8E   Northwich w/e 06/05/1961
16D   Annesley w/e 25/05/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 03/07/1965
9L   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 24/07/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 31/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 22/05/1948
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 8w/e 05/09/1959
LOAN 8E Northwich 5w/e 30/04/1960
EXLOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN 9K Bolton w/e 14/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8166
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
03/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
01/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48166    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
15/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
31/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
14/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48166    
04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev