Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8168 m/e 04/1943
British Railways 48168 w/e 22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
18A   Toton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
17A   Derby m/e 16/06/1956
15B   Kettering w/e 04/03/1961
16D   Annesley w/e 22/09/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 03/07/1965
9H   Patricroft w/e 24/07/1965
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/02/1966
9K   Bolton w/e 11/05/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 18B Westhouses w/e 21/08/1948
EXLOAN 18A Toton w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 9K Bolton w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 9K Bolton w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8168
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48168    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48168    
09/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev