Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2038 Week
» 10153 Month
» 137596 Year
» 1802972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8193 m/e 05/1942
British Railways 48193 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24769
To Service During 05/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/01/1968
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1942
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16A   Nottingham w/e 19/12/1959
16A   Toton w/e 14/09/1963
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 10/12/1966
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/06/1967
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 06/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 16A Toton 5w/e 12/10/1963
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 06/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8193
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24769
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
21/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48193    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
06/01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48193    
05/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev