Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 290 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1991 Week
» 10106 Month
» 137549 Year
» 1802925 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8212 m/e 08/1942
British Railways 48212 w/e 12/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24798
To Service During 08/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/06/1968
Service Life 25 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1942
18B   Westhouses on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley 4w/e 17/05/1952
18B   Westhouses 4w/e 17/05/1952
18C   Hasland 4w/e 29/12/1956
18A   Toton w/e 15/09/1962
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 17/04/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 18/12/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 04/02/1967
8E   Northwich w/e 29/04/1967
9H   Patricroft w/e 03/02/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 22/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 4w/e 08/05/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 06/05/1967
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 10/02/1968
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 22/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 1 bay) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Misc.) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe Works (Outside) Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8212
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24798
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B)    
12/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48212    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
04/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
03/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48212    
10/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev