Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3456 Week
» 5194 Month
» 132637 Year
» 1798013 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8214 m/e 08/1942
British Railways 48214 w/e 07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24801
To Service During 08/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/11/1967 off Patricroft (9H)
Service Life 25 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1942
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton w/e 11/02/1961
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 24/06/1961
16C   Derby w/e 16/11/1963
16D   Nottingham w/e 11/07/1964
16G   Westhouses w/e 10/04/1965
16B   Colwick w/e 22/10/1966
9H   Patricroft w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 25/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 25/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211
14/11/1965 Crewe Works (Main Erecting shop) Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. SLS/196512

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8214
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24801
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48214    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
16/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
11/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
25/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48214 from Patricroft (9H)    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev