Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 514 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3440 Week
» 5178 Month
» 132621 Year
» 1797997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 70301 m/e 06/1940
British Railways 48247 w/e 24/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 06/1940
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys
Information WD 301

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1940
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 08/04/1950
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 31/10/1953
8B   Warrington Dallam 8w/e 19/06/1954
8C   Speke Junction w/e 22/08/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 28/01/1961
1H   Northampton w/e 25/01/1964
5E   Nuneaton w/e 07/08/1965
10A   Carnforth w/e 04/06/1966
10F   Rose Grove w/e 06/05/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK 5B Crewe South w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 08/04/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 1H Northampton 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 09/07/1966
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 Crewe Works New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively.
Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484.
A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines.
Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright
SLS/194807
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1940 To Service To service as WD Number 70301
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
24/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48247    
08/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (1H)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
06/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48247    
12/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev