|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Ex-W.D. 2-8-0\'s | The last four-Nos. 48254/61/86/91-of the thirty-nine L.M.S. type W.D. 2-8-0 locomotives brought back from the Middle East during 1948, were put into traffic during W/E 31/12/49. | SLS/195002 |
10/12/1960 | Horwich Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1941 | To Service | To service as WD Number 70378 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
31/12/1949 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
31/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48254 | ||
04/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
14/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) | ||
12/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) | ||
12/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (16F) | ||
11/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48254 | ||
11/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |