Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 491 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3417 Week
» 5155 Month
» 132598 Year
» 1797974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8270 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 48270 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/12/1966
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1942
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby w/e 07/03/1959
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 16/10/1965
16C   Derby w/e 18/12/1965
16B   Colwick w/e 01/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 06/11/1965
ALLOC 16C Derby 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 17/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Crewe Works During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known.
Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F).
SLS/194905
04/09/1966 Derby Shed (Stored) Stored: 48083, 48103, 48270, 48370, 48604; Ex-Works: D163, D1950, D3248, D4155, D5177. Waiting Works: D5215/45/408. SLS/196610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8270
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
09/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48270    
07/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
17/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48270    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev