Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 585 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3511 Week
» 5249 Month
» 132692 Year
» 1798068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8293 m/e 10/1940
British Railways 48293 w/e 19/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Works Number 7037
To Service During 10/1940
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/06/1968
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Information While on loan to GWR involved in accident which saved it from WD service

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1969

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1940
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
15B   Kettering w/e 04/03/1961
16D   Annesley w/e 22/09/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 03/07/1965
8A   Edge Hill w/e 24/07/1965
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 22/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 10D Lostock Hall w/e 22/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1940 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8293
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7037
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
19/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48293    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
22/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48293    
01/1969 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev