Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 265 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1966 Week
» 10081 Month
» 137524 Year
» 1802900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8301 m/e 09/1943
British Railways 48301 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-158
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/03/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
28C   Carstairs on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18B   Westhouses w/e 05/03/1949
15B   Kettering w/e 11/02/1950
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 23/05/1959
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 26/11/1960
15A   Wellingborough w/e 15/09/1962
15C   Kettering w/e 11/01/1964
15B   Wellingborough w/e 18/01/1964
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 28/03/1964
15B   Wellingborough w/e 04/04/1964
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 26/06/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 10/07/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 11/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 18B Westhouses w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 18B Westhouses w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 15B Kettering w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 15C Kettering 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 11/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8301
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-158
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C)    
05/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
26/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48301    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15C)    
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
04/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
11/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48301    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev