Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1613 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15019 Week
» 68035 Month
» 187562 Year
» 3214415 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8307 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
British Railways |
48307 |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-158 |
To Service |
During 11/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/03/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/04/1962 |
Craven Arms MPD |
On 22nd April the following were on shed-3205, 8449, 45143, 48307 all 89A and also 45530 of 6G, which had failed on a Salop -Cardiff train. Since Knighton shed closed 1st January, banking duties there have been diagrammed to a Collett 0-6-0 from Craven Arms, leaving shed 4-10 a.m. for Knighton and returning late evening. This shed also works the Bitterley branch goods traffic now. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8307 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-158 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
06/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48307 |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
06/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48307 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|