Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2462 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15868 Week
» 68884 Month
» 188411 Year
» 3215264 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8308 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
British Railways |
48308 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-158 |
To Service |
During 11/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/04/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8308 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-158 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48308 |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (6E) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
13/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48308 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|