Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 548 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3474 Week
» 5212 Month
» 132655 Year
» 1798031 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8338 m/e 01/1944
British Railways 48338 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/06/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
15A   Wellingborough on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton m/e 16/06/1956
21A   Saltley 4w/e 11/08/1956
18A   Toton 4w/e 22/03/1958
15B   Kettering w/e 12/11/1960
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 17/12/1960
17A   Derby w/e 14/01/1961
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 04/03/1961
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/05/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 13/06/1964
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 26/09/1964
10C   Fleetwood w/e 07/08/1965
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 19/02/1966
9H   Patricroft w/e 09/12/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 08/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 15B Kettering 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 9H Patricroft w/e 30/12/1967
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 08/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/10/1945 Market Harborough Station On 19/10, 3151 2A was yard shunter, 22911 2A was banking goods trains up to Oxenden, and 203 2A was working on the Melton Mowbray branch. All these locos are sub-shedded at Market Harborough.8273 17C was on an up empty stock train. 8338 stalled on the bank up to Desborough, about mile from the station. The 2.35 p.m. semi-fast from Leicester was behind it, hauled by 5685 14B, which was standing in the station. 5685 was uncoupled and went to assist 8338 in the rear. After banking it for a short distance, 5685 returned to its train, which was delayed for, about 30 minutes. SLS/194601
31/01/1949 Crewe Works Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand.
Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox.
Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides.
Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three.
SLS/194903
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
09/12/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8338
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A)    
05/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48338    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
09/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
08/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48338    
11/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev