Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 338 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2039 Week
» 10154 Month
» 137597 Year
» 1802973 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8340 m/e 01/1944
British Railways 48340 w/e 04/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
5B   Crewe South on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden 3w/e 14/01/1950
1A   Willesden w/e 21/01/1950
9G   Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
9G   Northwich 4w/e 02/12/1950
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 13/02/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
8E   Northwich w/e 17/06/1967
10F   Rose Grove w/e 09/03/1968
9K   Bolton w/e 30/03/1968
10F   Rose Grove w/e 06/07/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NTH Northwich w/e 16/04/1949
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 9G Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 08/07/1967
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 09/03/1968
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 06/04/1968
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove on 01/07/1968
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102
16/01/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). SLS/196602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8340
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
04/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48340    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
30/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48340    
12/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev