Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8356 m/e 06/1944
British Railways 48356 w/e 18/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 24 yrs , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
15B   Kettering on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15B   Wellingborough w/e 15/02/1964
16B   Annesley w/e 08/05/1965
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 03/07/1965
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 24/07/1965
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 09/03/1968
9D   Newton Heath w/e 11/05/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 16B Annesley 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 09/03/1968
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 11/05/1968
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
10/10/1964 Crewe Works (Outside paint shop) Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. SLS/196411
24/07/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 45041/187/203/54/312, 48076/151/356/465/622, 75029, 92069/154, D223/35/56/87/91, D360, D1563/4/89/94, D1612/82/90, D1724/51/9/72, D5717, D8026/49, D1102-9. Electric shop: E3033/8/42/3/89, 26037; Adjoining Electric shop: D1500/14/8/687/715/60/813/58/88, D244, D297, D5252/7, D7584/5, 27000. Paint shop area: D200, D277, D342, D1101, D1716, D1841, D5709. Traverser area: 26009, 27005, D333, D1510/78/632/50/70/743/8/851/79/906/9, D5714, E3011/44/86. Test area: D397, D1542/59/82/95/710/7, D5275. Old C shop: E3016/45/67/173, D5102/3, D5704. Side of works: D386, D1581, D1853, D5710, 44779, 60007 for restoration, 70051, 71000, 75062. SLS/196609

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8356
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B)    
18/03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48356    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
08/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16B)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48356    
12/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev