Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 469 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19380 Week
» 84334 Month
» 286998 Year
» 3313851 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8360 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
British Railways |
48360 |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/07/1965 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2E |
Northampton |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
2E |
Northampton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
04/03/1961 |
ALLOC |
2E |
Northampton |
5w/e |
06/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
1E |
Bletchley |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8360 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48360 |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48360 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|