13/02/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. |
SLS/195903 |
14/06/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. |
SLS/196107 |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe Works (Dismantling Shed) |
Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. |
SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. |
SLS/196410 |
21/03/1965 |
Crewe Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. |
SLS/196505 |
29/10/1967 |
Crewe South MPD (Withdrawn) |
45285/7, 48018, 48729, 92047, 70004/24/31/45. Stored-48402, LNER 4498. Withdrawn-D2519, 15000/2, 42647, 43001/3/7/21, 44680/1/4, 44765, 44805/8/12/4/21/32/3/43/60/5, 44944, 45006/21/42/52/60/89,45186, 45243/70/8/97/8, 45308, 45405/94, 46520, 48220, 48364, 48474, 48521/2/48, 48603/43, 48725/67, 75029, 76051, 92100. |
SLS/196712 |