Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 342 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18145 Week
» 71161 Month
» 190688 Year
» 3217541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8384 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
48384 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/05/1968 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8384 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48384 |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48384 |
|
|
12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|