Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 270 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1971 Week
» 10086 Month
» 137529 Year
» 1802905 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8385 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 48385 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/12/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15A   Wellingborough w/e 06/11/1948
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 26/01/1963
1H   Northampton w/e 15/05/1965
2E   Saltley w/e 02/10/1965
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 17/09/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 03/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 07/06/1947
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/07/1947
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 13/12/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 10/04/1948
LOAN 15A Wellingborough w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 06/11/1948
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 1H Northampton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 03/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/11/1948 Oil burning equipment removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/05/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-44467G, 44603 G, 48186 I, 48405 G, 73030 I, 73032 G, 12092, D3767/8 New; Diesel Erecting shop-10202, 12053, ED4/5, D3085, D3491, D5702; New Work-8 d/e shunters 0-6-0 (D3769-76). Test House-D5015/6/7, D3124; Diesel Finishing Shop-D5018, D1 Scafell Pike, D2 Helvellyn; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay-42375I, 42505 I, 42641 I, 44036 G, 44092 G, 44097 G, 44195 I, 44206 I, 44213 G, 44387 G, 44582 G, 47255 G, 47378 I, 47442 G, 48088 I, 48374 G, 48636 G, 48673 I, 73136 I, 75005 I; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping-52532, 43982, 44049, 44211. Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay-41000 (Boiler RBS 5240 no, 12594, type G9 ex 40928; present state-6 frame inserts, boiler in, motion and slide bars in partly, driving splashers and footplate supports fitted), 42508 I, 42531 I, 44188 I, 44414 I, 47414 I, 73132 I; Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay - stripping-73144; Erecting Shop, no. 3 bay-4 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 (D3-6), 6 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo (D5019-24); Yard-40047, 40680, 43205/54, 42541, 42661, 44588, 45032, 47309, 48111, 48385, 48643, 53806, 58281, 10100, 10800, Cecil Raikes. Stored locos. moved into Wks. yard-40931, 41068, 41119/63/4/7/93, 43231/301/441/522/745 an 43815. Stored locos, by side of Test House-40412/536, 41062, 41857 an 47214. SLS/195906
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907
15/05/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
15/11/1964 Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8385
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48385    
06/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
27/11/1948 Modification Modification: Oil burning equipment removed    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
15/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (1H)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
03/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48385    
06/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev