Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 647 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14053 Week
» 67069 Month
» 186596 Year
» 3213449 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8389 |
m/e |
03/1945 |
British Railways |
48389 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 03/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/08/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8389 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48389 |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48389 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|