17/08/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. |
SLS/195909 |
15/12/1961 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. |
SLS/196201 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on Shed: D2908/9/13, 44043, 44200, 44539, 47587, 48392, 48495, 73133. |
SLS/196202 |
27/03/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. |
SLS/196605 |