Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 517 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3443 Week
» 5181 Month
» 132624 Year
» 1798000 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8393 m/e 04/1945
British Railways 48393 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1945
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby w/e 07/11/1959
16A   Nottingham w/e 28/11/1959
16G   Westhouses w/e 10/04/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 18/12/1965
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 12/11/1966
10F   Rose Grove w/e 17/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 2w/e 10/04/1965
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 1 bay) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109
21/03/1965 Crewe Works (Waiting Works) Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8393
Built at Horwich Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48393    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48393    
12/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev