Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16537 Week
» 69553 Month
» 189080 Year
» 3215933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8397 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
British Railways |
48397 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 06/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8397 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48397 |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (19C) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48397 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|