Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 288 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1989 Week
» 10104 Month
» 137547 Year
» 1802923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8422 on 10/12/1943
British Railways 48422 w/e 27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 349
To Service Sat 10/12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/03/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/12/1943
2C   Northampton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 01/12/1962
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 26/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 26/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 5B Crewe South w/e 24/05/1947
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC 2C Northampton w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 26/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/12/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8422
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C)    
27/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48422    
01/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
26/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48422    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev