Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 38 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4665 Week
» 6403 Month
» 133846 Year
» 1799222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8432 on 17/03/1944
British Railways 48432 w/e 23/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 351
To Service Sat 17/03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/03/1944
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17D   Rowsley 8w/e 19/06/1954
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/05/1959
18A   Toton w/e 27/01/1962
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 24/02/1962
16G   Westhouses w/e 14/09/1963
40E   Colwick w/e 25/12/1965
16G   Westhouses w/e 16/07/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 22/02/1947
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 19/04/1947
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 17D Rowsley 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 5w/e 12/10/1963
LOAN 16B Colwick on 03/01/1966
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 4w/e 06/08/1966
WDN   w/e 08/10/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/11/1966 Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8432
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
23/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48432    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17D)    
23/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
08/10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48432    
02/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev