Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8523 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
British Railways |
48523 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/02/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8523 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48523 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (9M) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48523 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|