Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8530 m/e 04/1945
British Railways 48530 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1980
To Service During 04/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/03/1966
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1945
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton 4w/e 28/01/1956
17A   Derby w/e 12/05/1962
15B   Kettering w/e 09/03/1963
15B   Wellingborough w/e 13/03/1965
15A   Leicester Midland w/e 26/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 22/03/1947
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 22/03/1947
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 19/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1945 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8530
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1980
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
18/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48530    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
19/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48530    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev