Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8554 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
British Railways |
48554 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1961 |
To Service |
During 06/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/08/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8554 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1961 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48554 |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48554 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|