Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 251 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1952 Week
» 10067 Month
» 137510 Year
» 1802886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8600 m/e 02/1943
British Railways 48600 w/e 14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/11/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 28/09/1963
16G   Westhouses w/e 29/02/1964
16B   Colwick w/e 22/10/1966
8L   Aintree w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 26/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1G Woodford Halse 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 26/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Works Yard) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8600
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
14/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48600    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
26/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48600    
05/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev