Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8605 m/e 07/1943
British Railways 48605 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9G   Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 13/02/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 17/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9G Northwich m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 06/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8605
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48605    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
06/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48605    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev